HI HCR9 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR9
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to EDU, WAM.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to EDU, WAM.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Board Of Education And Department Of Education To Support And Implement Community Schools As A Strategy For Increasing Access To A High-quality Education.
Title
Urging The Board Of Education And Department Of Education To Support And Implement Community Schools As A Strategy For Increasing Access To A High-quality Education.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeanne Kapela [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Lisa Marten [D] | Rep. Amy Perruso [D] |
Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 334). |
2021-03-31 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-31 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ohno excused (2). |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1550), recommending adoption. |
2021-03-30 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Yamashita, McDermott. |
2021-03-29 | House | Re-scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-30-21 11:00AM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-30-21 11:00AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-19 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). |
2021-03-19 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1107), recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-03-11 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Belatti, DeCoite, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Ohno, Quinlan, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane. |
2021-03-09 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 03-11-21 2:00PM in conference room 309 & 430 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 15 |
2021-01-25 | House | Offered |
2021-01-22 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR9 (Carry Over) 2021-04-01 - Referred to EDU, WAM.
HR10 (Same As) 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR10 (Same As) 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.