HI HCR88 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR88
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Referred to HHH, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Referred to HHH, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Health To Restore Funding For Certain Substance Use Disorder Treatment Agencies For The Fiscal Years 2022-2023 And 2023-2024 For Residential, Outpatient, And Adolescent School-based Services.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Health To Restore Funding For Certain Substance Use Disorder Treatment Agencies For The Fiscal Years 2022-2023 And 2023-2024 For Residential, Outpatient, And Adolescent School-based Services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to HHH, referral sheet 27 |
2022-03-11 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR81 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Referred to HHH, referral sheet 27
HCR88 (Carry Over) 2021-03-15 - Referred to HHH, HET, referral sheet 25
SCR213 (Same As) 2022-04-08 - Referred to HHH, EDN, referral sheet 47
HCR88 (Carry Over) 2021-03-15 - Referred to HHH, HET, referral sheet 25
SCR213 (Same As) 2022-04-08 - Referred to HHH, EDN, referral sheet 47
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=88&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HCR88_.HTM |