HI HCR82 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR82
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 937) in amended form (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 937) in amended form (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Formation Of A Task Force On North Road Management.
Title
Requesting The Formation Of A Task Force On North Road Management.
Sponsors
Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Rep. Stacelynn Eli [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Rep. Daniel Holt [D] |
Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-22 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 937) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-22-19. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2176) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-04-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere, Taniguchi. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-15-19 10:55AM in conference room 211. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2019-04-04 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-04 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2). |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2023), recommending adoption. |
2019-04-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Holt. |
2019-04-01 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-03-19 11:30AM in conference room 308. |
2019-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2). |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1831), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-03-22 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Hashem, Matayoshi, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen. |
2019-03-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 03-22-19 10:00AM in conference room 423. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2019-03-08 | House | Offered |
2019-03-07 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR82 (Carry Over) 2019-04-22 - Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 937) in amended form (SD 1).
HR47 (Same As) 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR47 (Same As) 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.