HI HCR80 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR80
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Maui County To Immediately Ban Predatory Cosmetics Stores From Doing Business In Lahaina.
Title
Urging Maui County To Immediately Ban Predatory Cosmetics Stores From Doing Business In Lahaina.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-22 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2019-04-22 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 925). |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Reported from CPH/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2223) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Ruderman. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-16-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Referred to CPH/PSM. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 607). |
2019-04-04 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-04 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2). |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2033), recommending adoption. |
2019-04-02 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cabanilla Arakawa, Kong, Mizuno, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Har, Onishi. |
2019-03-29 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 04-02-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-03-28 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Kong, C. Lee excused (3). |
2019-03-27 | House | Deferred one day 03-28-19. |
2019-03-27 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1760) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to CPC. |
2019-03-20 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Johanson, Quinlan, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Ichiyama. |
2019-03-15 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 03-20-19 10:15AM in conference room 309. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to EDB, CPC, referral sheet 33 |
2019-03-08 | House | Offered |
2019-03-07 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR80 (Carry Over) 2019-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR78 (Same As) 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR78 (Same As) 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.