HI HCR80 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR80
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 700) in amended form (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 700) in amended form (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Establish A Working Group To Study The Potential Transfer Of Management And Maintenance Of The Royal Mausoleum At Mauna ala To One Or More Appropriate Nonprofit Organizations.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Establish A Working Group To Study The Potential Transfer Of Management And Maintenance Of The Royal Mausoleum At Mauna ala To One Or More Appropriate Nonprofit Organizations.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 700) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Reported from HWN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1715) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Inouye, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Galuteria, English, Green, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-18-17 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Re-Referred to HWN/WTL. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Referred to HWN/WTL, WAM. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 414). |
2017-04-05 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-04-05 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1633), recommending adoption. |
2017-04-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Quinlan, Ward. |
2017-03-31 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-04-17 10:35AM in conference room 308. |
2017-03-29 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4). |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported from WAL/OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1478) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2017-03-21 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, Gates, Creagan, LoPresti, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite. |
2017-03-21 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Kong, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Lowen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Say, Fukumoto. |
2017-03-17 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL/OMH on Tuesday, 03-21-17 9:30AM in conference room 312. |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to WAL/OMH, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2017-03-07 | House | Offered |
2017-03-06 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR80 (Carry Over) 2017-04-24 - Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 700) in amended form (SD 1).