HI HCR77 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expressing Legislative Support For The Hawaii Food And Wine Festival And Declaring The Festival To Be The Next Agricultural And Culinary Movement In The State Of Hawaii.
Title
Expressing Legislative support for declaring the Hawaii Food and Wine Festival the State's next agriculture and culinary movement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Received notice of Agreement and Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 717). |
2014-04-23 | House | Adopted as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Tokioka, Wooley excused (3). |
2014-04-23 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2014-04-21 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 696) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-21-14. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Reported from EGH/TSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3470) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2014-04-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on TSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Ige, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele, Ihara. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EGH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Slom, Chun Oakland, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, English. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH/TSM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-14-14 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Referred to EGH/TSM. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 405). |
2014-03-31 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-03-31 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Hashem excused (2). |
2014-03-31 | House | Reported from EDB/TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1345-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2014-03-21 | House | The committees on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Cachola, Awana, Choy, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno, Takai. |
2014-03-21 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Ward, Awana, Brower, Cachola, Ito, Choy, Onishi, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno, Wooley. |
2014-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDB/TOU on Friday, 03-21-14 10:00AM in conference room 312. |
2014-03-10 | House | Referred to EDB/TOU, referral sheet 30 |
2014-03-06 | House | Offered |
2014-03-05 | House | To be offered. |