HI HCR73 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Management Audit Of The Corrections Division Of The Department Of Public Safety.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Management Audit Of The Corrections Division Of The Department Of Public Safety.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).
2019-03-27HouseReported from PVM/LMG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1758), recommending referral to FIN.
2019-03-20HouseThe committees on LMG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Cullen, Nakashima, Morikawa; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Ward.
2019-03-20HouseThe committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto, McDermott.
2019-03-15HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by PVM/LMG on Wednesday, 03-20-19 9:30AM in conference room 430.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to PVM/LMG, FIN, referral sheet 33
2019-03-08HouseOffered
2019-03-07HouseTo be offered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback