HI HCR73 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-22 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on TRN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kobayashi, Kong, Luke, Pouha, Rhoads excused (6).
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-22 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on TRN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kobayashi, Kong, Luke, Pouha, Rhoads excused (6).
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Appropriate State And County Agencies To Collaborate To Issue Multi-designation Special License Plates To Persons Who Qualify For More Than One Special License Plate.
Title
Special License Plates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on TRN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kobayashi, Kong, Luke, Pouha, Rhoads excused (6). |
2016-03-22 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1143-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to TRN. |
2016-03-21 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Tokioka, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Ohno, Onishi, Tsuji, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Kawakami, Kong, Woodson. |
2016-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by VMI on Monday, 03-21-16 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2016-03-11 | House | Referred to VMI, TRN, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2016-03-10 | House | Offered |
2016-03-09 | House | To be offered. |