HI HCR72 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR72
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to WLH/TIA, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to WLH/TIA, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Tax Review Commission And The Office Of Planning To Conduct Feasibility Studies To Determine Whether And How Green Fees Can Support Or Accelerate Progress Toward Hawaii's Climate Change Mitigation And Adaptation Benchmarks And Mandates.
Title
Urging The Tax Review Commission And The Office Of Planning To Conduct Feasibility Studies To Determine Whether And How Green Fees Can Support Or Accelerate Progress Toward Hawaii's Climate Change Mitigation And Adaptation Benchmarks And Mandates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Referred to WLH/TIA, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2020-03-05 | House | Offered |
2020-03-02 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR55 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Referred to WLH/TIA, FIN, referral sheet 39
HCR72 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 33
HCR72 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 33
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=72&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HCR72_.HTM |