HI HCR7 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-18 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on LMG with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Kawakami, Kong, Tokioka excused (4).
Pending: House Legislative Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-18 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on LMG with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Kawakami, Kong, Tokioka excused (4).
Pending: House Legislative Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Auditor To Assess The Probable Effects Of Licensing And Regulating Youth Sports Coaches.
Title
Auditor; Youth Sports Coach
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-18 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on LMG with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Kawakami, Kong, Tokioka excused (4). |
2016-03-18 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1126-16), recommending referral to LMG. |
2016-03-02 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Har, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima. |
2016-02-29 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-02-16 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2016-02-29 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-02-16 2:00PM. |
2016-02-26 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-29-16 2:05PM in conference room 325. |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred to CPC, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2016-01-25 | House | Offered |
2016-01-22 | House | To be offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=7&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HCR7_.HTM |