HI HCR69 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The Holy See, The Supreme Pontiff, And The Bishops Of The Catholic Church To Explore The Widespread Adoption Of Viri Probati, Or The Ordination To The Priesthood Of Certain Qualified Married Men.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The Holy See, The Supreme Pontiff, And The Bishops Of The Catholic Church To Explore The Widespread Adoption Of Viri Probati, Or The Ordination To The Priesthood Of Certain Qualified Married Men.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2019-03-20HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 03-22-19 2:10PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 33
2019-03-08HouseOffered
2019-03-07HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HR69 (Same As) 2019-03-22 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback