HI HCR67 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR67
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:20PM in conference room 309.
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:20PM in conference room 309.
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Board Of Education To Require Voter Registration In The State And Registration In The United States Selective Service System As A Condition For Receiving A Public High School Diploma In The State.
Title
Requesting The Board Of Education To Require Voter Registration In The State And Registration In The United States Selective Service System As A Condition For Receiving A Public High School Diploma In The State.
Sponsors
Rep. Nadine Nakamura [D] | Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Rep. Daniel Holt [D] |
Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] | Rep. Roy Takumi [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:20PM in conference room 309. |
2020-03-13 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by LHE on Monday, 03-16-20 2:20PM in conference room 309. |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred to LHE, JUD, referral sheet 39 |
2020-03-03 | House | Offered |
2020-02-28 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR67 (Carry Over) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Subjects
Prerequisite
Public High School Diploma
United States Selective Service Registration
Voter Registration
Public High School Diploma
United States Selective Service Registration
Voter Registration
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=67&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HCR67_.HTM |