HI HCR64 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR64
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-11 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-11 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Establishment Of A Working Group To Study The Feasibility Of Building An Additional Work Furlough Center On The Present Site Of The Oahu Community Correctional Center Once The Oahu Community Correctional Center Has Been Relocated To Halawa.
Title
Requesting The Establishment Of A Working Group To Study The Feasibility Of Building An Additional Work Furlough Center On The Present Site Of The Oahu Community Correctional Center Once The Oahu Community Correctional Center Has Been Relocated To Halawa.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-13 - House - House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-11 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1). |
2020-05-11 | House | Reported from PVM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1183-20), recommending referral to FIN. |
2020-03-13 | House | The committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Nishimoto, Ohno, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Gates. |
2020-03-11 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by PVM on Friday, 03-13-20 10:00AM in conference room 430. |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred to PVM, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2020-03-03 | House | Offered |
2020-02-28 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR48 (Same As) 2020-05-11 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1).
HCR64 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to WLH/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 33
HCR64 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to WLH/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 33