HI HCR61 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR61
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting Each Of The Several Counties To Assess The Roles And Responsibilities Of County Police Commissions, Especially With Regard To Police Misconduct Issues.
Title
Requesting Each Of The Several Counties To Assess The Roles And Responsibilities Of County Police Commissions, Especially With Regard To Police Misconduct Issues.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4). |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1461), recommending referral to FIN. |
2017-03-23 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, Morikawa, Nakashima, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Oshiro. |
2017-03-20 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-23-17 2:15PM in conference room 325. |
2017-03-02 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 25 |
2017-03-02 | House | Offered |
2017-02-23 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR61 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=61&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HCR61_.HTM |