HI HCR58 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR58
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to LCA, JDC.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to LCA, JDC.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The United States Congress And President Of The United States To Enact The Protecting The Right To Organize Act Of 2021 As Expeditiously As Possible.
Title
Urging The United States Congress And President Of The United States To Enact The Protecting The Right To Organize Act Of 2021 As Expeditiously As Possible.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Labor & Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Labor & Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | Senate | Referred to LCA, JDC. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 345). |
2021-03-31 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-31 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) Gates, Ohno excused (2). |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1625), recommending adoption. |
2021-03-29 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, Nakamura. |
2021-03-25 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JHA on Monday, 03-29-21 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-23 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JHA as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2021-03-23 | House | Reported from LAT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1133) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to JHA. |
2021-03-18 | House | The committees on LAT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Sayama, Belatti, Holt, D. Kobayashi, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Okimoto; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan. |
2021-03-15 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by LAT on Thursday, 03-18-21 9:00AM in conference room 312 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred to LAT, JHA, referral sheet 19 |
2021-03-04 | House | Offered |
2021-02-26 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR58 (Carry Over) 2021-04-01 - Referred to LCA, JDC.
HR47 (Same As) 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR47 (Same As) 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.