HI HCR53 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR53
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to TRN/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to TRN/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Hawaii Climate Change Mitigation And Adaptation Commission To Convene An Electric Vehicles Task Force To Study The Feasibility Of A Complete Transition To Electric Vehicles By The Year 2050.
Title
Requesting The Hawaii Climate Change Mitigation And Adaptation Commission To Convene An Electric Vehicles Task Force To Study The Feasibility Of A Complete Transition To Electric Vehicles By The Year 2050.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Referred to TRN/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2020-02-27 | House | Offered |
2020-02-26 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR38 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Referred to TRN/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 39
HCR53 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to LHE/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 33
HCR53 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to LHE/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 33
Subjects
complete transition to electric vehicles by the year 2050
electric vehicles task force
Hawaii Climate Change Adaptation and Mitigation Commission
electric vehicles task force
Hawaii Climate Change Adaptation and Mitigation Commission
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=53&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HCR53_.HTM |