HI HCR46 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Tokioka excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Tokioka excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Sunrise Analysis Of The Proposed Regulation Of Transportation Network Companies.
Title
Transportation Network Companies; Sunrise Analysis.
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Kong [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Lauren Matsumoto [R] | Rep. Andria Tupola [R] |
Rep. Gene Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Tokioka excused (2). |
2015-03-31 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1361) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2015-03-30 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Brower, Creagan, Har, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Fukumoto Chang, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Hashem, Kawakami, Yamane. |
2015-03-27 | House | Proposed draft of Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-30-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-03-27 | House | Re-referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 41 |
2015-02-23 | House | Referred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 23 |
2015-02-23 | House | Offered |
2015-02-20 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR21 (Same As) 2015-03-27 - Re-referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 41