HI HCR46 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Received notice of Agreement and Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 738).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Received notice of Agreement and Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 738).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing The Issuance Of A Term, Non-exclusive Easement Covering A Portion Of State Submerged Lands At Lanikai, Koolaupoko, Oahu, For Seawall And Revetment Purposes.
Title
Lanikai; Easement; Seawall; Department of Land and Natural Resources
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | Senate | Received notice of Agreement and Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 738). |
2013-04-24 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2013-04-24 | House | Adopted as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Brower, Har, Oshiro excused (3). |
2013-04-24 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2013-04-22 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 720) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1597) with recommendation of adoption. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Tokuda, Slom. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-10-13 9:51AM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 04-11-13 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-11-13 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1239), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Shimabukuro, Ihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL deferred the measure until 03-28-13 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-13 10:00AM in conference room 225. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 379). |
2013-03-15 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-15 | House | Adopted with Representative(s) Hanohano voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Jordan voting no (1) and Representative(s) Mizuno, Oshiro, Takai excused (3). |
2013-03-15 | House | Reported from OMH/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 990), recommending adoption. |
2013-03-11 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Coffman, Cullen, Hanohano, C. Lee, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, Thielen. |
2013-03-11 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Coffman, Evans, C. Lee, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami. |
2013-03-08 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by OMH/WAL on Monday, 03-11-13 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred to OMH/WAL, referral sheet 27 |
2013-02-19 | House | Offered |
2013-02-15 | House | To be offered. |