HI HCR42 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR42
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Todd, Woodson, Yamane excused (4).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Todd, Woodson, Yamane excused (4).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct An Audit Of Harbor Inspection Procedures Of State Departments For Shipping Containers To Prevent The Importation Of Illegal Fireworks Into The State.
Title
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct An Audit Of Harbor Inspection Procedures Of State Departments For Shipping Containers To Prevent The Importation Of Illegal Fireworks Into The State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Todd, Woodson, Yamane excused (4). |
2022-03-29 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1492-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to CPC. |
2022-03-23 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ilagan, Clark, Hashimoto, LoPresti, Nakamura, Takumi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kitagawa. |
2022-03-21 | House | Resolution re-scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 03-23-22 11:05AM in conference room 423 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-21 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 03-23-22 10:45AM in conference room 423 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to TRN, CPC, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Offered |
2022-03-08 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR37 (Same As) 2022-03-29 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Todd, Woodson, Yamane excused (4).
HCR42 (Carry Over) 2021-02-23 - Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 17
SCR84 (Same As) 2022-04-13 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HCR42 (Carry Over) 2021-02-23 - Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 17
SCR84 (Same As) 2022-04-13 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.