HI HCR36 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-15 - Referred to HMS/EGH/WAM.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-15 - Referred to HMS/EGH/WAM.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Hawaii Public Housing Authority And The Hawaii Housing Finance And Development Corporation To Create A Redevelopment Master Plan And More Housing Units For Kukui Gardens And Mayor Wright Homes.
Title
Kukui Gardens and Mayor Wright Homes; Development; Master Plan
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-15 | Senate | Referred to HMS/EGH/WAM. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 656). |
2013-04-12 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-12 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, McDermott, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). |
2013-04-12 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1640), recommending adoption. |
2013-04-10 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa. |
2013-04-08 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-10-13 3:15PM in conference room 308. |
2013-02-12 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1, with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no and Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Coffman, Takai excused. |
2013-02-12 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 350) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2013-02-11 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Woodson, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Carroll, Jordan. |
2013-02-08 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSG on Monday, 02-11-13 10:05AM in conference room 329. |
2013-02-08 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 20 |
2013-02-06 | House | Offered |
2013-02-05 | House | To be offered. |