HI HCR35 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-20 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, LoPresti, Luke, Oshiro, Saiki, Thielen excused (6).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Convening Of A Task Force To Assess The Scope And Feasibility Of Establishing A Statewide System Or Protocol In Which Advance Care Planning Forms Can Be Accessed By All Health Facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Task Force; Advance Care Planning Forms; Statewide System or Protocol

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-20HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, LoPresti, Luke, Oshiro, Saiki, Thielen excused (6).
2015-03-20HouseReported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 995) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
2015-03-13HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Jordan, Oshiro, Tupola.
2015-03-11HouseScheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-13-15 11:30AM in conference room 329.
2015-03-11HouseThe committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-13-15 at 11:30am.
2015-03-09HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-11-15 9:00AM in conference room 329.
2015-02-10HouseReferred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 13
2015-02-10HouseOffered
2015-02-09HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

SCR33 (Same As) 2015-04-01 - The committee on HTH deferred the measure.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback