HI HCR282 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-01 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no and Belatti, Say, Takumi, Tokioka, Wooley excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-01 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no and Belatti, Say, Takumi, Tokioka, Wooley excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Education To Expand Its Pilot Projects To Cool Hawaii's Classrooms.
Title
Cooling Hawaii's Classrooms; DOE Pilot Project
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-01 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no and Belatti, Say, Takumi, Tokioka, Wooley excused. | |
2011-04-01 | (H) Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1287), recommending referral to FIN. | |
2011-03-30 | (H) The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Belatti, Chang, Nakashima, Nishimoto, Takai, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Awana, Hanohano, Mizuno, Saiki, Wooley. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 03-30-11 9:00AM in conference room 309. | |
2011-03-21 | (H) Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 43 | |
2011-03-16 | (H) Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR249 (Same As) 2011-04-01 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no and Belatti, Say, Takumi, Tokioka, Wooley excused.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=282 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/HCR282_.HTM |