HI HCR27 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR27
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Health's Environmental Management Division To Ensure That Destinations To Which The State's Recyclable Waste Is Transported For Out-of-state Processing Abide By The Environmental Standards As Outlined By The Basel Convention.
Title
Urging The Department Of Health's Environmental Management Division To Ensure That Destinations To Which The State's Recyclable Waste Is Transported For Out-of-state Processing Abide By The Environmental Standards As Outlined By The Basel Convention.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 607). |
2021-04-20 | House | Adopted as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2021-04-20 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2021-04-16 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 795) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-16-21. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1749) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-04-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Acasio, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 04-09-21 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Referred to AEN/HTH. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 338). |
2021-03-31 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-31 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) Gates, Ohno excused (2). |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1588), recommending adoption. |
2021-03-29 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Onishi. |
2021-03-25 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-29-21 2:00PM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-24 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-24 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1324), recommending referral to CPC. |
2021-03-23 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Perruso, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi. |
2021-03-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-23-21 10:00AM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 03-19-21 10:30AM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-16 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Friday, 03-19-21 10:30AM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 15 |
2021-02-03 | House | Offered |
2021-02-02 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR27 (Carry Over) 2021-04-20 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR20 (Same As) 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR20 (Same As) 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.