HI HCR26 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Tokioka excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Tokioka excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing The Issuance Of A Term, Non-exclusive Easement Covering Portion Of State Submerged Lands At Kaneohe, Koolaupoko, Oahu, For The Use, Maintenance, And Repair Of The Existing Crm Wall, Landscaping Area, Floating Dock, And Concrete Pier Purposes Constructed Thereon.
Title
BLNR; Tax Map Key: (1) 4-4-022
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Tokioka excused (2). |
2015-03-31 | House | Reported from WAL/OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1346), recommending referral to FIN. |
2015-03-27 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Say, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Pouha. |
2015-03-27 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Lowen, Nishimoto, Say, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Pouha. |
2015-03-24 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL/OMH on Friday, 03-27-15 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2015-02-03 | House | Referred to WAL/OMH, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2015-01-28 | House | Offered |
2015-01-26 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR17 (Same As) 2015-06-16 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-16-15.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=26&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HCR26_.HTM |