HI HCR24 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR24
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing The Issuance Of A Term, Non-exclusive Easement Covering A Portion Of State Submerged Lands At Waiohuli-keokea Homesteads And Beach Lots, Kihei, Maui, For The Existing Seawall And Rock Revetment, And For Use, Repair, And Maintenance Of The Existing Improvements Constructed Thereon.
Title
Authorizing The Issuance Of A Term, Non-exclusive Easement Covering A Portion Of State Submerged Lands At Waiohuli-keokea Homesteads And Beach Lots, Kihei, Maui, For The Existing Seawall And Rock Revetment, And For Use, Repair, And Maintenance Of The Existing Improvements Constructed Thereon.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2021-04-19 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 814). |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Acasio). Transmitted to House. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1779) with recommendation of adoption. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-15-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1730), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-09-21 1:30PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 336). |
2021-03-31 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-31 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, McKelvey, Perruso, Wildberger voting no (4) and Representative(s) Gates, Ohno excused (2). |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1551), recommending adoption. |
2021-03-30 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Wildberger; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Yamashita, McDermott. |
2021-03-29 | House | Re-scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-30-21 11:00AM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-30-21 11:00AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-16 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) DeCoite, Kapela, McKelvey, Perruso voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Wildberger voting no (1) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-16 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 972), recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-03-11 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Ohno, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong. |
2021-03-08 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 03-11-21 9:00AM in conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 15 |
2021-01-27 | House | Offered |
2021-01-25 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR24 (Carry Over) 2021-04-19 - Resolution adopted in final form.
SCR18 (Same As) 2021-04-08 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) McKelvey voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso, Wildberger voting no (3) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
SCR18 (Same As) 2021-04-08 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) McKelvey voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso, Wildberger voting no (3) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).