HI HCR229 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Agriculture To Conduct A Study To Evaluate The Amount Of Agriculture In The State That Is Solely Used For Subsistence Farming.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Agriculture To Conduct A Study To Evaluate The Amount Of Agriculture In The State That Is Solely Used For Subsistence Farming.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1657-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-03-23 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, Gates, Ing, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) DeCoite; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-21 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-23-18 10:00AM in conference room 312. |
2018-03-21 | House | The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-23-18 10:00AM in conference room 312. |
2018-03-16 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-21-18 8:45AM in conference room 312. |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2018-03-09 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR199 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=229&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HCR229_.HTM |