HI HCR200 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR200
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designating February Of Each Year As Liver And Bile Duct Cancer Awareness Month In The State Of Hawaii.
Title
Designating February Of Each Year As Liver And Bile Duct Cancer Awareness Month In The State Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4). |
2019-03-27 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1740), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-03-21 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Say. |
2019-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 03-21-19 8:30AM in conference room 329. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2019-03-08 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR200 (Carry Over) 2019-03-27 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).
HR180 (Same As) 2019-03-27 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).
HR180 (Same As) 2019-03-27 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=200&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HCR200_.HTM |