HI HCR20 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-13 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Mizuno excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-13 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Mizuno excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing A Working Group To Develop Nutrition Guidelines For State Agencies.
Title
Working Group to Develop Nutrition Guidelines for State Agencies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Mizuno excused (1). |
2013-03-13 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 933) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2013-03-01 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Carroll, Jordan, Kobayashi, Woodson, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla. |
2013-02-21 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 03-01-13 9:00AM in conference room 329. |
2013-02-01 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 12 |
2013-01-24 | House | Offered |
2013-01-22 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR15 (Same As) 2013-04-30 - Deferred one day 05-02-13.