HI HCR19 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR19
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-15 - The committee on WAM has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 04-15-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-15 - The committee on WAM has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 04-15-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing The Issuance Of A Perpetual, Non-exclusive Easement Covering A Portion Of State Submerged Lands At Maunalua, Honolulu, Oahu, For The Existing Storm Drain, And For Use, Repair, And Maintenance Of The Existing Improvements Constructed Thereon.
Title
Authorizing The Issuance Of A Perpetual, Non-exclusive Easement Covering A Portion Of State Submerged Lands At Maunalua, Honolulu, Oahu, For The Existing Storm Drain, And For Use, Repair, And Maintenance Of The Existing Improvements Constructed Thereon.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | Senate | The committee on WAM has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 04-15-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-15-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1725), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-07-21 1:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 324). |
2021-03-30 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-30 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). |
2021-03-30 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1520), recommending adoption. |
2021-03-19 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino. |
2021-03-17 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Friday, 03-19-21 2:00PM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-16 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) DeCoite voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-16 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 967), recommending referral to CPC. |
2021-03-11 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Ohno, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong. |
2021-03-08 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 03-11-21 9:00AM in conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to WAL, CPC, referral sheet 15 |
2021-01-27 | House | Offered |
2021-01-25 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR19 (Carry Over) 2021-04-15 - The committee on WAM has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 04-15-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
SCR13 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SCR13 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.