HI HCR180 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR180
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Transportation, Mayor Of The City And County Of Honolulu, And Honolulu City Council To Reroute Farrington Highway In Accordance With The 1998 Makaha Beach Park Master Plan.
Title
Urging The Department Of Transportation, Mayor Of The City And County Of Honolulu, And Honolulu City Council To Reroute Farrington Highway In Accordance With The 1998 Makaha Beach Park Master Plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - House Transportation: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - House Transportation: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1713), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 04-08-21 3:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Referred to TRS, WAM. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 388). |
2021-03-31 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-31 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ohno excused (2). |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1580), recommending adoption. |
2021-03-30 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Yamashita, McDermott. |
2021-03-29 | House | Re-scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-30-21 11:00AM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-30-21 11:00AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-23 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2021-03-23 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1143), recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-03-19 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ilagan, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Nakamura, Takumi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-03-16 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 03-19-21 10:30AM in conference room 423 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 25 |
2021-03-12 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR180 (Carry Over) 2021-04-13 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
HR149 (Same As) 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR149 (Same As) 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.