HI HCR175 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-5)
Status: Passed on April 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-23 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-5)
Status: Passed on April 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-23 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The United States Congress To Designate The Honor And Remember Flag As A National Symbol Of Our Nation's Concern And Commitment To Honoring And Remembering The Lives Of All Members Of The Us Armed Forces Who Have Lost Their Lives In The Line Of Duty.
Title
Honor and Remember Flag
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-23 | (H) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2010-04-23 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 636). | |
2010-04-23 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. | |
2010-04-22 | (S) One Day Notice 04-23-10. | |
2010-04-22 | (S) Reported from PSM/TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3233) with recommendation of adoption. | |
2010-04-21 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TIA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Gabbard, Espero, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2010-04-21 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, English, Gabbard, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Bunda, Kidani, Hemmings. | |
2010-04-16 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM/TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 04-21-10 1:30PM in conference room 312. | |
2010-03-31 | (S) Referred to PSM/TIA. | |
2010-03-31 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 297). | |
2010-03-30 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-03-30 | (H) Adopted with none voting no and Takai, Thielen excused. | |
2010-03-30 | (H) Reported from EBM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1075-10), recommending adoption. | |
2010-03-25 | (H) The committees on EBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Evans, Takai, Tokioka, Tsuji, Wooley; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Berg, Manahan, Wakai, Ward. | |
2010-03-22 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by EBM on Thursday, 03-25-10 10:00AM in conference room 312. | |
2010-03-10 | (H) Referred to EBM, referral sheet 45 | |
2010-03-08 | (H) Offered | |
2010-03-05 | (H) To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR110 (Same As) 2010-03-30 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.