HI HCR174 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR174
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Office Of Veterans' Services To Study How The Increase In Burial Service Requests Has Affected The Hawaii State Veterans Cemetery.
Title
Requesting The Office Of Veterans' Services To Study How The Increase In Burial Service Requests Has Affected The Hawaii State Veterans Cemetery.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1691-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-03-22 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) LoPresti, Cachola, Choy, Ito, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto. |
2018-03-20 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by VMI on Thursday, 03-22-18 10:20AM in conference room 429. |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2018-03-09 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR146 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
HCR174 (Carry Over) 2017-03-14 - Referred to LAB/HLT, CPC, referral sheet 30
HCR174 (Carry Over) 2017-03-14 - Referred to LAB/HLT, CPC, referral sheet 30