HI HCR174 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-27 - (H) The committee(s) on HLT/HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-27 - (H) The committee(s) on HLT/HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Centers For Medicare & Medicaid Services, Private Health Insurers, And Private Health Providers To Adopt The Principles And Health Care Guidelines In The Dartmouth Atlas Of Health Care.
Title
Dartmouth Atlas of Healthcare; Adoption of Principles and Guidelines
Sponsors
Rep. Rida Cabanilla Arakawa [D] | Rep. Pono Chong [D] | Rep. Derek Kawakami [D] | Rep. Joey Manahan [D] |
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Joseph Souki [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-27 | (H) The committee(s) on HLT/HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | |
2012-03-22 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT/HUS on Tuesday, 03-27-12 10:00AM in conference room 329. | |
2012-03-20 | (H) Referred to HLT/HUS, CPC, referral sheet 50 | |
2012-03-14 | (H) Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR134 (Same As) 2012-03-27 - (H) The committee(s) on HLT/HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=174 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HCR174_.HTM |