HI HCR165 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-16 - (S) Referred to HTH/PGM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-16 - (S) Referred to HTH/PGM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Alcohol Retailers And Licensed Premises Under Chapter 281, Hawaii Revised Statutes, To Post A Sign In Or About The Premises Warning Women Not To Drink Alcoholic Beverages During Pregnancy And The Department Of Health To Continue Its Efforts To Provide Statewide Training On Fetal Alcohol Spectrum Disorder Prevention, Identification, And Interventions.
Title
Warning Signs; Alcohol Consumption; Pregnant Women
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. Heather Giugni [D] | Rep. Jo Jordan [D] | Rep. Marilyn Lee [D] |
Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Marcus Oshiro [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-16 | (S) Referred to HTH/PGM, WAM. | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 600). | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Chang, Kawakami, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1779-12), recommending adoption. | |
2012-04-11 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Yamane, Brower, Coffman, Ito, Keith-Agaran, Tsuji, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Luke, McKelvey, Souki, Ching. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 04-11-12 2:00PM in conference room 325. | |
2012-04-03 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Mizuno, Thielen excused (4). | |
2012-04-03 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1482-12), recommending referral to CPC. | |
2012-04-02 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Morikawa, Belatti, Hanohano, Jordan, Mizuno, Ching; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Wooley, Pine. | |
2012-03-29 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Monday, 04-02-12 10:30AM in conference room 329. | |
2012-03-29 | (H) This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 04-03-12 10:30AM in conference room 329. | |
2012-03-29 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 04-03-12 10:30AM in conference room 329. | |
2012-03-20 | (H) Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 50 | |
2012-03-14 | (H) Offered |