HI HCR161 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-03 - (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Carroll, Mizuno, Thielen excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-03 - (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Carroll, Mizuno, Thielen excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Chief Elections Officer To Convene A Voter Participation Task Force On Voter Registration And Voter Turnout In Hawaii.
Title
Voter Participation Task Force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-03 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Carroll, Mizuno, Thielen excused (4). | |
2012-04-03 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1488-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2012-04-02 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Coffman, Herkes, Ito, Luke, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Cabanilla, Carroll, McKelvey. | |
2012-03-27 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 04-02-12 2:15PM in conference room 325. | |
2012-03-20 | (H) Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 50 | |
2012-03-14 | (H) Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR125 (Same As) 2012-04-03 - (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Carroll, Mizuno, Thielen excused (4).
SCR150 (Same As) 2012-03-16 - (S) Referred to JDL.
SCR150 (Same As) 2012-03-16 - (S) Referred to JDL.