HI HCR150 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR150
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Commerce And Consumer Affairs To Revisit Title 16, Chapter 89, Of The Hawaii Administrative Rules To Prohibit Registered Nurses From Delegating The Interpretation Of Diagnostic Laboratory Results To Unlicensed Assistive Personnel.
Title
Urging The Department Of Commerce And Consumer Affairs To Revisit Title 16, Chapter 89, Of The Hawaii Administrative Rules To Prohibit Registered Nurses From Delegating The Interpretation Of Diagnostic Laboratory Results To Unlicensed Assistive Personnel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-24 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1293) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to CPC. |
2021-03-23 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti. |
2021-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 03-23-21 9:00AM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to HHH, CPC, referral sheet 25 |
2021-03-12 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR150 (Carry Over) 2021-03-24 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
HR126 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
HR126 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).