HI HCR150 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR150
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-18-20 10:45AM in conference room 309.
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-18-20 10:45AM in conference room 309.
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism To Convene A Working Group To Explore And Propose Methods To Incentivize Women Entrepreneurship In Hawaii.
Title
Urging The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism To Convene A Working Group To Explore And Propose Methods To Incentivize Women Entrepreneurship In Hawaii.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-18-20 10:45AM in conference room 309. |
2020-03-16 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 03-18-20 10:45AM in conference room 309. |
2020-03-11 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 40 |
2020-03-06 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR150 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to WLH, JUD, referral sheet 33
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=150&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HCR150_.HTM |