HI HCR148 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR148
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JHA as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Matsumoto, McDermott, Okimoto, Quinlan, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) Hashem, Holt, Ohno, Todd excused (4).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JHA as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Matsumoto, McDermott, Okimoto, Quinlan, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) Hashem, Holt, Ohno, Todd excused (4).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Endorsing And Adopting The Treaty On The Prohibition Of Nuclear Weapons And Urging Federal Leaders And The Nation To Make Nuclear Disarmament The Centerpiece Of United States' National Security Policy.
Title
Endorsing And Adopting The Treaty On The Prohibition Of Nuclear Weapons And Urging Federal Leaders And The Nation To Make Nuclear Disarmament The Centerpiece Of United States' National Security Policy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - House - House Culture, Arts, & International Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JHA as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Matsumoto, McDermott, Okimoto, Quinlan, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) Hashem, Holt, Ohno, Todd excused (4). |
2022-03-30 | House | Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1534-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to JHA. |
2022-03-23 | House | The committees on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Tam, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 03-23-22 10:40AM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to CAI, JHA, referral sheet 27 |
2022-03-11 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR148 (Same As) 2022-03-30 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JHA as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Matsumoto, McDermott, Okimoto, Quinlan, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) Hashem, Holt, Ohno, Todd excused (4).
HCR148 (Carry Over) 2021-03-24 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
SCR237 (Same As) 2022-03-16 - Referred to PSM.
HCR148 (Carry Over) 2021-03-24 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
SCR237 (Same As) 2022-03-16 - Referred to PSM.