HI HCR139 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR139
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-19 - The committee on HTH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-19 - The committee on HTH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Commerce And Consumer Affairs To Conduct An Analysis Regarding The Scopes Of Practice For Advanced Practice Registered Nurses And Physician Assistants.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Commerce And Consumer Affairs To Conduct An Analysis Regarding The Scopes Of Practice For Advanced Practice Registered Nurses And Physician Assistants.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | Senate | The committee on HTH deferred the measure. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | The committee on CPN deferred the measure. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 04-19-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Referred to HTH/CPN. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 382). |
2022-04-01 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-01 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Nakamura voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, McKelvey, Ohno, Okimoto, Quinlan excused (5). |
2022-04-01 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1667-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2022-03-29 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-03-24 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 03-29-22 10:00AM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to HHH, referral sheet 27 |
2022-03-11 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR139 (Same As) 2022-04-01 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR139 (Carry Over) 2021-03-15 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 25
HCR139 (Carry Over) 2021-03-15 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 25
Subjects
Advanced Practice Registered Nurses
Analysis
Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs
Physician Assistants
Scope of Practice
Analysis
Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs
Physician Assistants
Scope of Practice