HI HCR133 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR133
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Probate Court To Increase Transparency Regarding The Kamehameha Schools Trustee Selection Process.
Title
Requesting The Probate Court To Increase Transparency Regarding The Kamehameha Schools Trustee Selection Process.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Holt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-22 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2019-04-22 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 929). |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-22-19. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2183) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Ihara. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Re-Referred to HWN. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 04-16-19 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to HWN/JDC. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 527). |
2019-04-02 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-02 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Saiki, Todd, Yamane excused (4). |
2019-04-02 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1947), recommending adoption. |
2019-03-22 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Say, Yamane. |
2019-03-20 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 03-22-19 2:10PM in conference room 325. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 33 |
2019-03-08 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR133 (Carry Over) 2019-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR123 (Same As) 2019-04-02 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR123 (Same As) 2019-04-02 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=133&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HCR133_.HTM |