HI HCR127 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR127
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-4)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 40
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 40
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The President Of The United States, United States Congress, United States Department Of Health And Human Services, And United States Centers For Disease Control And Prevention To Fully Support Hawaii In The Screening, Prevention, And Containment Of Covid-19.
Title
Urging The President Of The United States, United States Congress, United States Department Of Health And Human Services, And United States Centers For Disease Control And Prevention To Fully Support Hawaii In The Screening, Prevention, And Containment Of Covid-19.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 40 |
2020-03-06 | House | Offered |
2020-03-05 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR106 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 40
HCR127 (Carry Over) 2019-04-03 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HCR127 (Carry Over) 2019-04-03 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=127&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HCR127_.HTM |