HI HCR119 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Received notice of Agreement and Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 738).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Received notice of Agreement and Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 738).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Budget And Finance To Conduct A Study On The Feasibility Of Using Social Impact Bonds To Fund Early Learning Programs And Services In The State.
Title
Social Impact Bonds; Early Learning Programs and Services
Sponsors
Rep. Jo Jordan [D] | Rep. Mele Carroll [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Scott Nishimoto [D] |
Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | Senate | Received notice of Agreement and Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 738). |
2013-04-24 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2013-04-24 | House | Adopted as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Brower, Har, Oshiro excused (3). |
2013-04-24 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2013-04-22 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 726) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Reported from EDU/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1600) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-04-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-19-13 1:30PM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Referred to EDU/WAM. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 675). |
2013-04-12 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-12 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, McDermott, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). |
2013-04-12 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1663), recommending adoption. |
2013-04-10 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa. |
2013-04-08 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-10-13 3:00PM in conference room 308. |
2013-04-01 | House | Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 47 |
2013-03-14 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 37 |
2013-03-13 | House | Offered |
2013-03-12 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR90 (Same As) 2013-04-12 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=119&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HCR119_.HTM |