HI HCR117 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-15 - Referred to TIA/HMS/PSM.
Pending: Senate Transportation and International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-15 - Referred to TIA/HMS/PSM.
Pending: Senate Transportation and International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The United States Congress To Include Resident Citizens Of The Freely Associated States As "qualified Aliens" Under The Personal Responsibility And Work Opportunity Reconciliation Act In Recognition Of Their Unique Historic And Ongoing Sacrifices And Contributions To The United States Of America.
Title
Micronesia; Palau; Marshall Islands; Personal Responsibility and Work Opportunity Reconciliation Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Takai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-15 | Senate | Referred to TIA/HMS/PSM. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 673). |
2013-04-12 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-12 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, McDermott, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). |
2013-04-12 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1637) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2013-04-05 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Belatti, Ito, C. Lee, Tsuji, Wooley, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Cabanilla, Carroll, Kawakami, McDermott. |
2013-04-02 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 04-05-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-01 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Kawakami, McKelvey excused (2). |
2013-04-01 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1297), recommending referral to JUD. |
2013-03-27 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Brower, Cachola, Onishi, Takayama, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Choy, Ohno, McDermott. |
2013-03-22 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 03-27-13 8:30AM in conference room 312. |
2013-03-14 | House | Referred to VMI, JUD, referral sheet 37 |
2013-03-13 | House | Offered |
2013-03-12 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR88 (Same As) 2013-04-12 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=117&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HCR117_.HTM |