HI HCR116 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-22 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-22 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging The Hawaii State Foundation On Culture And The Arts To Utilize The Art In Public Places Program To Include More Art Programs For Children.
Title
Hawaii State Foundation on Culture and the Arts; Art Programs; Children
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Takai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-22 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Reported from TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1614), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TEC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Nishihara, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Slom. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 04-16-13 1:20PM in conference room 414. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Referred to TEC, WAM. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 383). |
2013-03-28 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-28 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, Ito, C. Lee, Tokioka excused (4). |
2013-03-28 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1268), recommending adoption. |
2013-03-20 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tsuji, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-03-19 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2013-03-14 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 03-20-13 8:30AM in conference room 312. |
2013-03-14 | House | Referred to VMI, referral sheet 37 |
2013-03-13 | House | Offered |
2013-03-12 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR87 (Same As) 2013-03-28 - Resolution adopted in final form.