HI HCR113 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR113
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Transportation To Study Ways To Encourage All Police And Fire Stations In The State To Have A Certified Child Passenger Safety Technician Available To Inspect Child Passenger Restraint Systems.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Transportation To Study Ways To Encourage All Police And Fire Stations In The State To Have A Certified Child Passenger Safety Technician Available To Inspect Child Passenger Restraint Systems.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2018-04-23 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 818). |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Reported from TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3808) with recommendation of adoption. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Espero, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 04-18-18 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Re-Referred to TRE. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Referred to TRE/PSM. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 435). |
2018-04-04 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-04 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Fukumoto, Holt, C. Lee, McKelvey excused (5). |
2018-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1779-18), recommending adoption. |
2018-04-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Tupola, Ward. |
2018-03-29 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-03-18 10:05AM in conference room 308. |
2018-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1621-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-03-21 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Quinlan, Brower, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem. |
2018-03-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 03-21-18 9:45AM in House conference room 423. |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2018-03-09 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR101 (Same As) 2018-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR113 (Carry Over) 2017-05-05 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR113 (Carry Over) 2017-05-05 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=113&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HCR113_.HTM |