HI HCR111 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-29 - (H) The committee(s) on HUS/HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-29 - (H) The committee(s) on HUS/HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Attorney General To Establish A Task Force To Study The Feasibility Of The Counties Adopting Rules That Regulate Clean And Sober Housing And Comply With Federal And State Laws.
Title
Clean and Sober Housing; Regulation Feasibility; Task Force
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-29 | (H) The committee(s) on HUS/HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | |
2012-03-28 | (H) Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-29-12 9:25AM in conference room 329. | |
2012-03-22 | (H) The committee(s) on HUS/HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-29-12 at 9:25 AM. | |
2012-03-20 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HUS/HLT on Thursday, 03-22-12 10:30AM in conference room 329. | |
2012-03-15 | (H) Referred to HUS/HLT, JUD, referral sheet 47 | |
2012-03-14 | (H) Offered | |
2012-03-13 | (H) To be offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=111 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HCR111_.HTM |