HI HCR104 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR104
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 626).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 626).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Director Of Labor And Industrial Relations To Convene A Task Force To Study, Design, And Develop A Paid Family Leave Pilot Program.
Title
Requesting The Director Of Labor And Industrial Relations To Convene A Task Force To Study, Design, And Develop A Paid Family Leave Pilot Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Labor & Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Labor & Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 626). |
2021-04-22 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2021-04-19 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 830) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1776) with recommendation of adoption. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-15-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1720), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fevella. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 04-09-21 3:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Referred to LCA, WAM. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 364). |
2021-03-31 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-31 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, LoPresti, Perruso voting no (3) and Representative(s) Gates, Ohno excused (2). |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1546), recommending adoption. |
2021-03-30 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Yamashita, McDermott. |
2021-03-29 | House | Re-scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-30-21 11:00AM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-30-21 11:00AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-23 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Kapela voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) LoPresti voting no (1) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2021-03-23 | House | Reported from LAT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1135) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-03-18 | House | The committees on LAT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Sayama, Belatti, Holt, D. Kobayashi, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan. |
2021-03-16 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by LAT on Thursday, 03-18-21 9:00AM in conference room 312 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 25 |
2021-03-12 | House | Offered |
2021-03-11 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR104 (Carry Over) 2021-04-23 - Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 626).
HR86 (Same As) 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR86 (Same As) 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.