HI HB993 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB993
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-29 - Referred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-29 - Referred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the offense of unlawful shipment of tobacco products. Includes e-liquid and electronic smoking devices within the definition of "tobacco products", as used in the cigarette tax and tobacco tax law. Increases the license fee for persons engaged as a wholesaler or dealer of cigarettes and tobacco products. Increases the retail tobacco permit fee for retailers engaged in the retail sale of cigarettes and tobacco products. Repeals certain provisions of the Hawaii Revised Statutes relating to electronic smoking devices. Effective January 1, 2022.
Title
Relating To Tobacco Products.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB993 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
SB1147 (Same As) 2021-03-16 - Re-referred to HHH, CPC, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 26
SB1147 (Same As) 2021-03-16 - Re-referred to HHH, CPC, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 26
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=993&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB993_.HTM |