HI HB992 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB992
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-30 - The committee(s) on PVM recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-30 - The committee(s) on PVM recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals requirement that a disabled veteran be in receipt of disability retirement pay in order to be exempt from the payment of annual vehicle registration fees.
Title
Relating To Car Registration Fee Exemption For Disabled Veterans.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-30 | House | The committee(s) on PVM recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PVM on Wednesday, 01-30-19 11:20AM in House conference room 430. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to PVM, TRN, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB992 (Carry Over) 2019-01-30 - The committee(s) on PVM recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB1218 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to TRS/PSM, WAM.
SB1218 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to TRS/PSM, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=992&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB992_.HTM |