HI HB966 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Act 018, on 4/23/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1118).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Act 018, on 4/23/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1118).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Corrects the inadvertent repeal of wording from section 237-23, Hawaii Revised Statutes and provides a retroactive effective date. (HB 966 HD1)
Title
General Excise Tax; Nonprofit Organizations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-23 | House | Act 018, on 4/23/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1118). |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Act 018, 4/23/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1118). |
2015-04-15 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2015-04-14 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 591). |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1504) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Slom. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-02-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1056) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Gabbard, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-15 9:15AM in conference room 016. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 254). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 810), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-03-05 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Pouha. |
2015-03-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-05-15 10:30AM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Pouha excused (1). |
2015-02-18 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 267) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-10 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Kawakami, Thielen. |
2015-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-10-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-02-06 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-10-15 at 2:00 pm in room 325. |
2015-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-06-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-01-29 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1135 (Same As) 2015-01-28 - Referred to WAM.